Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Blankenship, Lacey Marie, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case represented by Leri, Craig A, against Blankenship, David Scott, represented by Lane, David R, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Julia L. Scrogin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJulia L. Scrogin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 20, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time56 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration | |
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Objection - No Fee | |
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Consolidated | |
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing On Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing On Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Judge: Scrogin, Julia L |
|
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Firearms Turned In or Sold | |
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing On Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Judge: Scrogin, Julia L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.