Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Walters, Alexandra, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case represented by Berrier, Yana, against Barker, Brent, represented by Van Den Heuvel, Mark R, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Benjamin Z. Wirtschafter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenjamin Z. Wirtschafter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 01, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Restraining Order After Hearing | |
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing On Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Response - No Fee | |
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Firearms Turned In or Sold | |
May 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice | |
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Marysville Police Department Jurisdiction | |
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Confidential Clets Information | |
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte on Court's Own Motion
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.