Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cress, Henry, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Cress, Darci Rene, represented by Collins, David John, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Terry N. Spies presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry N. Spies Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions35 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
|
Case Cycle Time132 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of | |
March 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause re Contempt
Judge: Scrogin, Julia L |
|
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing On Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Dismissed by Court | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing On Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Order/Stipulation for Judge Pro Tem | |
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.