Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gonzalez, Karla Azucena, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Mojarro, Jesus Geovanni, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Richardson, Paul K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichardson, Paul K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Request for Order - DV/TRO
Date: September 20, 2021Request for Order - DV/TRO
Date: October 25, 2021Request for Order - DV/TRO
Date: November 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Short Cause
Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO
Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Short Cause
Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO
Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Trial Readiness Conference Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Trial Readiness Conference Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (CLETS-TRO) | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Modification REQUEST TO SET ASIDE RO Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.