Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Adams, Kris, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Broderick, Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Cortes, Sonia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCortes, Sonia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Request for Order - DV/TRO
Date: October 07, 2021Request for Order - DV/TRO
Date: November 15, 2021*Trial Setting Conference
Date: November 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Long Cause DV/TRO Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Trial Readiness Conference
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Trial Readiness Conference
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.