Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Astran, Mikayla Marie, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Scheuerman, Peter Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Sonia Cortés presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSonia Cortés Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 09, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing (CLETS OAH) EXPIRES AUGUST 31, 2024 |
|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (in Person) (CLETS) (Domestic Violence) PERSONALLY SERVED PETER SCHEUERMAN WITH NTC OF HRG ON 8/12/21 |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing Notice of Disclosure by Court |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents ORDER AFTER HEARING |
|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Disclosure by Court |
|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Denied Restraining Order | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | *Domestic Violence Filing | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | *New Filed Case (JBSIS) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.