Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Holtmann, Ruth, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Holtmann, David, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Richardson, Paul K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichardson, Paul K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 28, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Family Law and Motion Minute Order Request for Order - DV/TRO Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney JASON P. HOPPER, ESQ. IN PLACE OF PRO PER RESP |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration FILED BY RESP |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED SHAHID MANZOOR WITH RESPONSE, INC AND EXP DECL, AND SUB OF ATTORNEY ON 8/15/2021 BY ELECTRONIC SERVICE |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response - No Fee RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDER, FILED BY RESP |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED DAVID HOLTMANN IN PERSON WITH TRO, NOTICE OF HEARING, REQUEST FOR ORDER AND OTHER RELATED DOCUMENTS ON 8/11/2021 FILED BY PET |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (CLETS-TRO) | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing (Domestic Violence) | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | *New Filed Case (JBSIS) | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Received TRO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.