Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Paredes, Maria Angelia, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Hernandez, Marco Antonio, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Richardson, Paul K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichardson, Paul K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 28, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Request for Order - DV/TRO
Date: August 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE RICHARDSON- ORDER AFTER HEARING |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO
Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Request for Order - DV/TRO Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE CORTES FOR REVIEW OF DV-116 AND AMENDED DV-110 |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order (CLETS-TRO) AMENDED |
|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED MARCO ANTONIO IN PERSON HERNANDEZ WITH DV AND RELATED DOCUMENTS ON 8/5/2021 FILED BY PET |
|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing (Domestic Violence) | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (CLETS-TRO) | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | *New Filed Case (JBSIS) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.