Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Gizzo, Frank G, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Duree, Kaycee, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with Richardson, Paul K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichardson, Paul K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 28, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Further Court Trial
Date: February 07, 2022*Review
Date: September 26, 2022*Ex Parte
Date: March 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Short Cause
Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
June 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Trial Readiness Conference
Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Settlement Conference re DVRO/OSC Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Family Law and Motion Minute Order *Trial Setting Conference Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance Frank Gizzo; Kaycee Duree |
|
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Trial Setting Conference Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Beronio, Janene |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.