Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Jones, Jasmine, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Aguilera, Joseph William, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Richardson, Paul K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichardson, Paul K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 07, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Request for Order - DV/TRO
Date: June 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO
Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED JOSEPH AGUILERA W/ TRO ON 6/22/2021 |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PERSONALLY SERVED JOSEPH WILLIAM AGUILERA WITH ATTACHMENTS, NOTICE OF COURT HEARING, ORDER ON REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING, REQUEST FOR DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDER, TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ON 6/22/2021 |
|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing TILL 9/8/2021 |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Request for Order - DV/TRO Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | *Restraining Order After Hearing | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing (Domestic Violence) | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (CLETS-TRO) | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment JUDGE RICHARDSON |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | *Domestic Violence Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.