Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Blackburn, Alyssa J, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Neundorfer, Michael P, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Cortes, Sonia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCortes, Sonia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 19, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Request for Order - DV/TRO
Date: May 10, 2021*Ex Parte
Date: September 29, 2021*Request for Order: Modification
Date: September 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Modification
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Ex Parte Petitioner Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Granted As to Ex Parte Set by Petitioner |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To EX PARTE DOCS SENT TO COURTROOM CLERK |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request Phone call received from Petitioner to set Ex Parte, referred to Self Help / Empower Yolo for documents |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Received EX PARTE DOCUMENTS |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents WE ARE RETURNING THIS FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: PLEASE SCAN YOUR DOCUMENTS IN THE CORRECT ORDER (PAGES ARE NUMBERED AT THE BOTTOM - ADDITIONAL PAGE CAN GO LAST), DATE THEM AND RESUBMIT |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order - Modification DOMESTIC VIOLENCE ORDER |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Modification DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY PETN Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail (CLETS) (DV Prev) SERVED MICHAEL NEUNDORFER BY MAIL WITH FL300 AND MC20 ON 8/19/21 FILED BY PET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.