Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Mcgregor, Kirk, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Mcgregor, Leslie, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Richardson, Paul K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichardson, Paul K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Request for Order - DV/TRO
Date: June 01, 2021*Review
Date: September 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Review
Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Review Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Request for Order - DV/TRO Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO
Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL: SERVED KIRK MCGREGOR WITH DV-120 RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDER ON 4/29/2021 | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response - No Fee RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDER FILED BY LESLIE MCGREGOR |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Lodged Document RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE RICHARDSON |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order Guide & File - DVRO Request |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.