Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Mendez, Ciara Renee, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Rose, Kevin Leon, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Richardson, Paul K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichardson, Paul K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Request for Order - DV/TRO
Date: June 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO
Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO
Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Request for Order - DV/TRO Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO
Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE RICHARDSON |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | *Domestic Violence Filing | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (CLETS-TRO) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.