Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Singh, Suhani, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Singh, Ronald, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with Beronio, Janene presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeronio, Janene Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 05, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
*Request for Order: Modification
Date: June 15, 2023*Review
Date: December 14, 2022*Review
Date: December 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Short Cause
Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED RONALD SINGH BY MAIL WITH FL-321; USB; POLICE REPORTS ON 03.18.24 |
|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To LODGED USB PLACED ON CAL SHELF |
|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Lodged Documents USB FILED BY SUHANI SINGH |
|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Witness List Filed FILED BY SUHANI SINGH |
|
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order - DV/TRO Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance All Parties |
|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED SUHANI BHARAT BY MAIL WITH DV-720 RESPONSE ON 02/26/24 |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service INCOMPLETE DOCUMENT; 4A INCOMPLETE |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Response - No Fee TO REQUEST TO RENEW RESTRAINING ORDER FILED BY RONALD SINGH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.