Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Hernandez Rivera, Albert, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Rivera, Kerri Michele, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Richardson, Paul K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichardson, Paul K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 05, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Request for Order - DV/TRO
Date: April 26, 2021*Request for Order: Enforcement
Date: January 04, 2022Request for Order - DV/TRO
Date: May 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Review
Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - THIS FILING IS BEING RETURNED BECAUSE EACH FILING MUST BE SCANNED UNDER THEIR OWN FILING CODES. PLEASE CORRECT AND RESUBMIT. |
|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Report Received CCRC Report |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order: Enforcement Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Referral to Family Court Services Mediation Referred to Child Custody Recommending Counseling with Milton Kalish |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance Notice INCOMPLETE FILED BY RESP |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration RESPONSIVE DECLARAITON TO REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY PETITIONER |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance Notice FILED BY PETITIONER |
|
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order - No Fee STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.