Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Turner, Megan Ashley, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Gutierrez, Joshua Michael, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with SONIA CORTES presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSONIA CORTES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 08, 2021 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
*Request for Order: Initial
Date: April 22, 2021*Review
Date: June 24, 2021*Request for Order: Initial
Date: July 22, 2021*Request for Order: Initial
Date: August 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Modification CHILD SUPPORT Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Initial Child support / CCRC review Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service BY MAIL; SERVED JOSHUA MICHAEL GUTIERREZ WITH MINUTE ORDER DATE 08/26/2021, INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION, DECLARATION ON 09/14/2021 |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration FILED BY MEGAN ASHLEY TURNER |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Issue: Child Support | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | *Request for Order - Modification | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration FILED BY PETITIONER |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Initial
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration FILED BY PETITIONER |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order: Initial Support Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.