Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ramirez, Juana, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Sanchez, Manuel, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Maguire, Daniel P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaguire, Daniel P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 10, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Family Law and Motion Minute Order Request for Order - DV/TRO Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (in Person) (CLETS) (Domestic Violence) PERSONALLY SERVED MANUEL SANCHEZ W/ TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, REQUEST FOR DVRO, AND NOTICE OF HEARING ON 12/19/2020 |
|
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing (Domestic Violence) | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (CLETS-TRO) | |
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE MAGUIRE FOR REVIEW OF DVRO |
|
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment JUDGE MAGUIRE |
|
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.