Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Delgado, Alyssa Marie, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Rocha, Daniel Jose, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with Cortes, Sonia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCortes, Sonia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 03, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedApril 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
*Request for Order - DV/TRO
Date: November 25, 2020*Review
Date: January 27, 2021*Review
Date: November 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Short Cause 3 hours Judge: Brown, Danette C. |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To CAL SHELF- DEPT. 4 WITH EXHIBITS |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List PETITIONER'S EXHIBIT LIST |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Witness List Filed PETITIONER'S WITNESS LIST |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Received PETITIOENR'S EXHIBITS |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Review CCRC Judge: Brown, Danette C. |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Respondent |
|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order - Initial FILED BY PETITIONER |
|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure FILED BY PETITIONER |
|
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Review CCRC report Judge: Petre, Donna M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.