Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Rahiman, Fareeda, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Safiq, Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Richardson, Paul K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichardson, Paul K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 20, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedAugust 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Ruling
Date: August 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Ruling Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Restraining Order After Hearing Terms and conditions same as original Restraining order |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ruling and argument on DV/TRO Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Family Law and Motion Minute Order Further Court Trial Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To ORDER ON REQ TO CONT HEARING SENT TO JUDGE RICHARDSON |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Long Cause
Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order REQUEST TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE OR ZOOM AND ORDER AND/OR CONFIRM APPEARANCE BY ZOOM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.