Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Gibbs, Alana L, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Lacik, Timmy Rowland, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with Maguire, Daniel P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaguire, Daniel P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 14, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time21 days |
*Request for Order: Modification
Date: July 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order: Modification PETITIONER'S REQUEST RE: DVRO Judge: Borack, Jerilyn L. |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order - Modification PETITIONER'S REQUEST RE: DVRO |
|
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PERSONALLY SERVED TIMMY ROWLAND LACIK WITH DV-130 RESTRANING ORDER AFTER HEARING ON 11-5-2020 |
|
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request Granted req for R.O. granted |
|
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event | *Restraining Order After Hearing | |
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO
Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing (CLETS OAH) EXPIRES 11/4/2025 AT MIDNIGHT |
|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (in Person) (CLETS) (Domestic Violence) SERVED TIM LACIK WITH DV-109 AND DV-110 ON 10/25/2020 |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing (Domestic Violence) | |
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE MAGUIRE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.