Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jackson, Sheranne, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hernandez, Heliodoro, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Richardson, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichardson, Paul Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 09, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJuly 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
*Request for Order: Initial
Date: December 09, 2020*Request for Order: Initial
Date: January 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Initial CHILD SUPPORT, CUSTODY, VISITATION Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Report Received CCRC Report |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED RESP WITH PETITION AND SUMMONS ON 11/21/2020 BY PERSONAL SERVICE |
|
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Initial
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Referral to Family Court Services Mediation REFERRED TO CHILD CUSTODY RECOMMENDING COUNSELING WITH LACY CARTER |
|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment JUDGE CORTES |
|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order - Initial CUSTODY , VISITATION AND SUPPORT BY PET |
|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition for Dissolution/Legal Sep/Nullity. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.