Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Camacho, Echoe, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Camacho, Victor Johnpaul, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Richardson, Paul K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichardson, Paul K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 08, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJuly 18, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
*Request for Order: Initial
Date: November 25, 2020*Ex Parte
Date: December 22, 2020*Jurisdictional
Date: December 29, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Review
Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Report Received CCRC Report |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service ELECTRONICALLY SERVED VICTOR CAMACHO WITH EXHIBITS ON 9/24/2021 |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment TO JUDGE RICHARDSON |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Recusal JUDGE CORTES |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Referral to Family Court Services Mediation Referred to Child Custody Recommending Counsleing with Yesenia Casas |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Review CCRC / therapist's letter Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents FLASH DRIVE |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To FLASH DRIVE SENT TO IT |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL WITH FLASH DRIVE FILED BY ECHOE CAMACHO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.