Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sullivan, Matthew, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Sullivan, Telly, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Maguire, Daniel P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaguire, Daniel P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 07, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJuly 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
*Ex Parte
Date: October 16, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Initial REVIEW OF CCC Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order - Modification CHILD CUSTODY; VISITATION; CHILD SUPPORT; FATHER REQUESTS ORDERS TO ALLOW HIM TO MOVE OUT OF STATE WITH DAUGHTER FILED BY PETN |
|
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Referral to Mediator/Investigator | |
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Family Law and Motion Minute Order *Ex Parte Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING NOTICE AND SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY EMERGENCY (EX PARTE) ORDERS, FILED BY PET | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To EX PARTE PAPERWORK SENT TO CLERK IN D3 FOR 10/23 HEARING |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request PHONE CALL FROM PETNR REQ EX PARTE-SET 10/23/20 9AM D3 |
|
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Ex Parte
Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To FEE WAVIER SENT TO JUDGE MAGUIRE FOR REVIEW |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) AMENDED FILED BY MATTHEW OLIVER SULLIVAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.