Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Givens, Kimberly D, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Givens, Steven M, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Virginia L. Gingery presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVirginia L. Gingery Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management678 days |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Time To Trial1590 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions848 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Modification DCSS Motion for Modification of Child Support and Health Care filed 10/27/2022 Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Motion as to Petitioner | |
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Motion as to Respondent | |
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
RFO-OSC-MTN - Modification (DCSS Only) Motion for Modification of Child Support and Health Care |
|
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Notice Regarding Payment of Support, Notice of Registration, and Statement for Registration as to Petitioner | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Notice Regarding Payment of Support, Notice of Registration, and Statement for Registration as to Respondent | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Registration of California Support Order | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Statement for Registration of California Support Order | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice re Payment of Support | |
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference dismissal Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.