Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Baus, Steven, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Baus, Jessica, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Corie J. Caraway presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCorie J. Caraway Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Time To Trial1274 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions79 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time122 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney - Spencer Gysin | |
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS
Judge: Caraway, Corie J |
|
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Respondent's RFO Filed 09/13/19 Re: Custody, Visitation, Child Support, Suspend Earnings Assignment - 1/2 day Estimes Judge: Caraway, Corie J |
|
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration | |
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Brief Respondent's Hearing Brief |
|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Brief Trial Brief |
|
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS
Judge: Caraway, Corie J |
|
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing - Modification Respondent Filed 09-13-18 Re Custody, Visitation, Child Support and Suspend Earnings Assignment, Continued From 5-14-19 regarding Child Support and Suspend Earnings Assignment Judge: Caraway, Corie J |
|
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.