Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Poppen, Ryan, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Poppen, Lexxi, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with William R. Patrick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam R. Patrick Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions185 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time352 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference Desc: 2ND FL STATUS CONF (CRC 5.83) Desc2: FTA:6/18/14 Notice Date: 2014-06-18 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 936 - OFF-CALENDAR, REQUIREMENTS MET Disp Clerk: JDW Filing Clerk: MMH Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling NTC OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW |
|
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTERED - MSE = 11/18/14 HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW | |
July 02, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT & CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: (Further) FL STATUS CONF (CRC 5.83) 6/18/14 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH |
|
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference - Initial Desc: 1st FL STATUS CONFERENCE (CRC 5.83) Disp Code: 906 - CONTINUED TO 12/17/14 Disp Clerk: MMH Filing Clerk: DLB Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
May 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons Filed POS OF SUMMONS FILED JD: 5/17/14 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW |
|
May 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Service Information Name: POPPEN, LEXXI PartyId: FL044954_2_210_2 Service Type: CER Summons Date: 2014-05-17 00:00:00.0000000 |
|
May 17, 2014 | Docket Event | ||
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER ON COMMUNICATION/DOCUMENT POS INCOMPLETE; UNKNOWN RECIPIENT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.