Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Barker, Kale, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Barker, Yaling, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Sandra L. McLean presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandra L. McLean Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions277 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing Petitioner filed 6/24/19 for Change in Child Custody Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
RFO-OSC-MTN - (Custody or Visitation FC3170) RFO for Child Custody |
|
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing - Modification Petitioner Filed 08-08-18 Re Modification of Custody, Child Support and Spousal Support Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of MC-030, FL-150, FL300 & FL-320 served on Respondent |
|
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 3:00 Ex Parte Hearing |
|
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Hearing - Postdispo by Respondent: 08/07/18 for Emergency Support for Travel to China / Modification of Orders Made 08/01/18 Judge: Roberts, Barbara L |
|
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration | |
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.