Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hardy, William Flint, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Sanchez, Sharon Ann, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Stephen E. Benson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen E. Benson Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions241 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time266 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference Desc: 2ND FL STATUS CONF (CRC 5.83) Disp Code: 947 - VACATED Disp Clerk: NPA Filing Clerk: MMH Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
September 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney SUBST OF ATTY FOR [P] ; OLD ATTY: C LAPOINTE NEW ATTY: PRO PER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: NPA |
|
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF JUDGMENT OF DISSO FILED 8/22/14 AS TO [D] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: NPA | |
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling NTC OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: NPA |
|
August 22, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTERED - MSE= 08/22/2014 HON. STEPHEN E. BENSON; JUDGE (B07) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: NPA | |
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration for Default - Uncontested DECL FOR DEFAULT OR UNCON DISSO - FC2336 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: NPA |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT CHECKLIST Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: NPA |
|
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference - Initial Desc: 1st FL STATUS CONFERENCE (CRC 5.83) Disp Code: 342 - HEARD IN PART-CONT FOR FURTH HRG 9/16/14 Disp Clerk: MMH Filing Clerk: DLB Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement [P] FL CASE MGMT: STATUS CONF STMT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW |
|
April 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration re Service of Declaration of Disclosure DECL RE SERVICE OF PRELIM & FINAL DECL OF DISCL & INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION [P] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.