Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Stephen E. Benson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen E. Benson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2013 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Minor - Person Only |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Cycle Time72 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Appointment Desc: APPT GUARDIAN OF MINOR, PERSON ONLY Desc3: *CONT FOR POSSIBLE DISMISSAL* Disp Code: 112 - DISMISSED Disp Clerk: JDW Filing Clerk: DLB Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY COURT INV Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW |
|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver ORDER ON APP FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES/COSTS AFTER HEARING GRANTED IN WHOLE TO GRDN HON. WILLIAM R PATRICK; JUDGE (B04) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH |
|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing Desc: [GUARDIAN] APPL RE FEE WAIVER Desc2: FILED: 02/06/14 Disp Code: 340 - GRANTED IN FULL Disp Clerk: MMH Filing Clerk: DLB Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
February 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC ON HEARING ABOUT COURT FEES Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
|
February 06, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR HEARING ABOUT COURT FEE WAIVER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB | |
February 05, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER CONTINUING TEMPORRY GUARDIANSHIP OF THE PERSON HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB | |
February 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Appointment Desc: APPT GUARDIAN OF MINOR, PERSON ONLY Desc2: FILED 12/23/13 *W/ TEMPS* Desc3: -CONT FROM 1/15/14- Disp Code: 906 - CONTINUED TO 03/05/14 Disp Clerk: DLB Filing Clerk: DLB Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
February 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information COURT INVESTIGATORS REQ FOR CONTINUANCE & REFERRAL TO CSD Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
|
January 30, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF DECLARATION AS TO GUARDIAN Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.