Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bhojak, Eric R, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Durkin, Cypress, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Sandra L. McLean presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandra L. McLean Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Time To Trial1788 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1375 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1375 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Setting/Resetting
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail notice of hearing |
|
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of the Court Continuing Hearing from 11/15/18
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Brief Respondent's Trial Brief |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Witness List Respondent's Witness and Exhibit List |
|
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Rescheduling | |
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Petitioner's Order to Show Cause and Affidavit for Contempt filed 09/12/18; 1/2 day time estimate; Court Reporter Requested Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Other Civil and Family Law Advisement of Rights |
|
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Predisposition Petitioner's OSC and Affidavit for Contempt filed 09/11/18 - Cont for Acceptance of Counsel, James Petelin Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.