Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Byers, Angela D, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Byers, Christopher T, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions727 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time873 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Copy Work Mailed mailed to Dawn Byers |
|
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTERED - MSE = 12/16/15 HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (C10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JAR | |
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling NTC OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JAR |
|
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information [P] FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT CHECKLISST Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARN |
|
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration re Service of Declaration of Disclosure [P]DECL RE SERVICE OF PRELIM DECL OF DISCLOSURE & INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARN |
|
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT & CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARN | |
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration for Default - Uncontested DECL FOR DEFAULT OR UNCON DISSO - FC2336 PETNR Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARN |
|
June 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: DISMISSAL HEARING-CCP 583 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARE |
|
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference Desc: 3RD FL STATUS CONF (CRC 5.83) Notice Date: 2014-12-16 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 906 - CONTINUED TO 3/21/18 FOR DISMISSAL Disp Clerk: ARE Filing Clerk: JLV Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
December 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: 3RD FL STATUS CONF (CRC 5.83) 12/10/14 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JLV |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.