Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Varciag, Mia, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Morrar, Samira, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with William R. Patrick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam R. Patrick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2013 |
CategoryPre-Jbsis Family Law |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Cycle Time51 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [P] REQ: DV/TRO *TEMPS GRANTED* Desc2: FILED 12/16/13 Desc3: -CONT'D FOR POS Disp Code: 331 - DISMISSED Disp Clerk: TMS Filing Clerk: MMH Judge: McNelis, Steven R |
|
February 04, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE BY MAIL 2/3/14 AS TO [P] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JLV | |
February 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL OF [R] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JLV |
|
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order RESPONSE TO REQ FOR DVRO Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW |
|
January 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL OF [R] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JLV |
|
January 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL OF [P] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JLV |
|
January 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PROOF OF *NON* SERVICE OF TRO DOCUMENTS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JLV |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Application - No Fee NOTICE OF NEW HEARING & ORDER ON REISSUANCE HON. WILLIAM R PATRICK; JUDGE (B04) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [P] RFO: DV/TRO Desc2: FILED 12/16/13 Desc3: TEMPS GRANTED Disp Code: 940 - REISSUED TO 2/05/14;COFFE Disp Clerk: MMH Filing Clerk: JLV Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
December 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order DV-TEMP RESTRAINING ORDER TEMPS GRANTED PP H/D CCPOR HON. STEPHEN E. BENSON; JUDGE (B07) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JLV |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.