Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Waybright, Elizabeth, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Waybright, Jeromy L, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Sandra L. McLean presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandra L. McLean Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2012 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1328 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1362 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing - Modification [Petitioner] Custody, Child Support, & Visitation filed 11/17/16 Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO [Petitioner] filed 12/05/2016 Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Findings and Order After Hearing Hearing Date: 12/21/16 Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of the Response to the DV served on the Petitioner |
|
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration | |
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration | |
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Restraining Order | |
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Declaration as to Respondent |
|
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service DV100, 109; as to Respondent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.