Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Byer, Richard, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Mosier, Stacey, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2012 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions69 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
|
Case Cycle Time683 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF MINUTES & ORDER FILED OCT 21 : 11-3-2014 AS TO [P] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KLN | |
October 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER - FAMILY SUPPORT HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
October 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS MTN FOR MOD C/S & CONSOLIDATION Desc2: FLD 05/27/14*CONT'D FROM 10/15/14 Disp Code: 340 - GRANTED, ORDER MADE Disp Clerk: SAT Filing Clerk: SAT Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
October 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [R] RFO: MOD VISTN Desc2: FILED 6/11/14 Desc3: -CONT FOR RECEIPT OF MEDIATION REPORT Disp Code: 399 - HEARD, MEDN RECC ADOPTED Disp Clerk: SAT Filing Clerk: JLV Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
October 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS MTN FOR MOD OF C/S & CONSOLIDATION Desc2: FILED 5/27/14 Desc3: *ADVANCED FROM 10/07/14* Disp Code: 906 - CONTINUED TO 10/21/14 Disp Clerk: SAT Filing Clerk: ARE Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
October 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL OF DCSS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Report of Child Custody Recommending Counselor REPORT OF SUPERIOR COURT CHILD CUSTODY RECOMMENDATION COUNSELOR *REC'D/HELD* Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JAR |
|
October 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS MTN FOR MOD OF C/S & CONSOLIDATION Desc2: FILED 05/27/14 Desc3: CONT FROM 07/15/14 FOR STATUS Disp Code: 948 - VACATED & RESCHEDULED TO 10/15/14 Disp Clerk: ARE Filing Clerk: TMS Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
September 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL OF STACEY MOSIER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KKA |
|
August 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING (FAMILY LAW) DCSS MTN FOR MOD C/S & CONSOL-FLD 5/27/ Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.