Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Earnest, Christy, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Earnest, Nathan, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2012 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Time To Trial312 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions341 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time341 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 26, 2013 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTERED - MSE = 11/26/13 HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS | |
November 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling NTC OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS |
|
October 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Desc: FAMILY LAW - LONG CAUSE - 1 HR Desc2: [R] AT ISSUE FILED 08/02/13 Desc3: ISSUES: DISSO Disp Code: 340 - DISSO GRANTED Disp Clerk: BAN Filing Clerk: TMS Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
October 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Generic Hearing Desc: ISSUES Disp Code: 947 - VACATED Disp Clerk: TMS Filing Clerk: JDW Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
October 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Trial Setting Conference Desc: TRAC --- 1 HR Desc2: [R] AT ISSUE FILED 8/2/13 Desc3: [Issues: DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE] Notice Date: 2013-08-15 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 386 - TRIAL DATE SET 10/28/13 Disp Clerk: DAB Filing Clerk: JDW Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
August 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: TRAC --- 1 HR [R] AT ISSUE FILED 8/2/13 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW |
|
August 02, 2013 | Docket Event | AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY [R] [] JURY [X] COURT TRIAL - 1 HR Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW | |
July 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information STATEMENT REGARDING DISCOVERY BY THE [R] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS |
|
July 05, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF THE EXHIBIT LIST, WITNESS LIST AND STATEMENT LIST SERVED ON THE [P] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS | |
July 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information WITNESS LIST BY THE [R] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.