Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fleshman, Brad, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Fleshman, Nicole, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Robert A. Glusman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert A. Glusman Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryNullity W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions145 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time145 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Other hearing Desc: NOTICE OF HEARING FOR: Desc2: COURTS OWN MOTION RE: NULLITY Notice Date: 2007-05-07 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 996 - NOTICE SENT Disp Clerk: SAS Filing Clerk: SAS Judge: Glusman, Robert A |
|
May 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion hearings - Predispo Desc: COURT'S OWN MOTION Desc2: JUDGMENT FOR NULLITY Disp Code: 340 - GRANTED Disp Clerk: SAS Filing Clerk: SAS Judge: Glusman, Robert A |
|
May 23, 2007 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTERED & NOTICES MAILED HON. ROBERT A GLUSMAN; JUDGE (B12) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAS | |
May 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: NOTICE OF HEARING FOR: COURTS OWN MOTION RE: NULLITY Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAS |
|
February 27, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT & CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAS | |
January 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt NTC AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT JD=01/08/07 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAS |
|
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
Petition or First Paper-Disso, Legal Sep, Nullity, Dom Part PETITION/FIRST PAPER FOR NULLITY/DISSOLUTION *NO CHILDREN* CK8020 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 559923 Fee Amount: 320.00 Entry Clerk: SAT 488 - $320.00 |
|
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued and Filed SUMMONS ISSUED/MAINTAINED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.