Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bonham, Amber, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Stevens, Justin, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Kurt W. Worley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKurt W. Worley Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2006 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions663 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time2624 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS
Judge: Worley, Kurt W |
|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Modification DCSS Motion for Modification of Child Support Filed 01/12/2021 Judge: Worley, Kurt W |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of the Motion as to Petitioner | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
RFO-OSC-MTN - Modification (DCSS Only) DCSS Motion for Modification for Child Support |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of the Motion as to Respondent | |
March 05, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF MINUTES & ORDER FILED 02/25/14 TO [P] ON 03/04/14 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SNB | |
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS MTN FOR H/C Desc2: FILED 01/08/14 Disp Code: 399 - ORDERS MADE Disp Clerk: ARE Filing Clerk: TMS Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER - FAMILY SUPPORT OF HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARE |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion - Fee NOM RE: H/C BY DCSS Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 60.00 Entry Clerk: TMS 493 - $60.00 |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF THE NOM SERVED ON THE [P] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.