Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mcclurg, Chris, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Miller, Jessica, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with William R. Patrick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam R. Patrick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2006 |
CategoryPre-Jbsis Family Law |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Cycle Time1156 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2010 | Docket Event | RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING EXP 2/24/15, CC BCSO Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SLG | |
February 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [P] HEARING TO RENEW RESTRAINING ORDER Desc2: FILED 2/10/10 Disp Code: 340 - GRANTED - 5 YEARS Disp Clerk: SLG Filing Clerk: JAR Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
February 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF DV-130, 700 & 710 IN PER ON 2/16/10 TO [R] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
|
February 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF HEARING TO RENEW RESTRAINING ORDER *PP HD* CC: BCSO HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JAR |
|
February 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information REQUEST TO RENEW RESTRAINING ORDER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JAR |
|
February 28, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (ROAH) AS TO JESSICA MILLER ON 2/27/07 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JAR | |
February 21, 2007 | Docket Event | RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING EXPIRES 02/21/10 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS | |
February 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [P] OSC: DV/TRO CLETS *W/CHILDREN* Desc2: FILED 12-27-06*CONT'D FROM 1-31-07 FOR Desc3: R TO FILE MTN OR RESPONSE* Disp Code: 340 - 3 YR RESTRAINING ORDER GRANTED Disp Clerk: TMS Filing Clerk: TMS Judge: McNelis, Steven R |
|
January 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [P] OSC: DV/TRO (CLETS) W/CHILDREN Desc2: FILED 12/27/06 *NO TEMPS* Desc3: *1ST REISSUANCE* Disp Code: 342 - HEARD/CONT'D TO 2-21-07 Disp Clerk: SAT Filing Clerk: LXW Judge: McNelis, Steven R |
|
January 29, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (DV-TRO & REISSUANCE OF TRO) AS TO JESSICA MILLER ON 1/17/07 CC BCSO Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JAR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.