Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Williamson, Steven W, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Williamson, Sarah K, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Steven R. McNelis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSteven R. McNelis Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2006 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions147 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time3328 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF: REGISTRATION OF CALIFORNIA SUPPORT ORDER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: NPA |
|
October 03, 2012 | Docket Event | RECEIPT FLD - TRANSFER RCVD FROM SACRAMENTO COUNTY - CASE # 12FL05718 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TLC | |
September 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: NTC OF PROOF OF MAILING TRANSFER TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TLC |
|
September 21, 2012 | Docket Event | CHANGE OF VENUE (RECORD PREP FOR TRANSFER) TO SACRAMNETO COUNTY CK# 1117 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 803864 Fee Amount: 50.00 Entry Clerk: TLC 453 - $50.00 | |
September 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: REVIEW HEARING Desc2: *CONFIRM TRANSFER OF CASE* Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR; FEES HAVE BEEN PAID Disp Clerk: TLC Filing Clerk: JDW Judge: McNelis, Steven R |
|
August 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: NTC OF PROOF OF MAILING ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER W/ FW-006 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW |
|
August 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request to Waive Court Fees APP FOR ORDER WAIVING COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY [P] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW |
|
August 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver ORDER ON APP FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES/COSTS DENIED TO [P] HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW |
|
August 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request to Waive Court Fees APP FOR ORDER WAIVING ADDITIONAL COURT FEES FILED BY [P] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW |
|
August 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Findings and Order After Hearing FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER HEARING 8/22/12 HON. STEVEN R MCNELIS, JUDGE (BSM) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.