Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lehman, Jeanne, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Mcdaniel, Jennifer, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Steven R. McNelis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSteven R. McNelis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2006 |
CategoryPre-Jbsis Family Law |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [P] OSC: DV/TRO NO CHILDREN Desc2: FILED 12/21/06 *TEMPS DENIED* Desc3: *1ST REISSUANCE* Disp Code: 326 - DENIED/OFF CAL/NO APP BY THE [P] Disp Clerk: TMS Filing Clerk: SAT Judge: McNelis, Steven R |
|
February 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF DV/TRO, BLK ANSWER, EX PARTE IN PER ON 01/31/07 AS TO [R] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
|
January 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [P] OSC: DV/TRO Desc2: *FILED 12/21/06* *TEMPS DENIED* Disp Code: 940 - REISSUED TO 2/7/07 8:30 Disp Clerk: LXW Filing Clerk: SAS Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
January 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application without Hearing APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR REISSUANCE OF DV/TRO 1/17/07 TO 2/7/07 *GRANTED IN COURT* HON. WILLIAM R PATRICK; JUDGE (B04) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: LXW |
|
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order DV-TEMP RESTRAINING ORDER & NTC OF HEARING PETNR *TEMPS DENIED SET FOR HRG* *PP HD* HON. STEVEN R MCNELIS, JUDGE (BSM) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
|
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information DENIAL OF TRO - SET FOR HRG ONLY *PP HD* HON. STEVEN R MCNELIS, JUDGE (BSM) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
|
December 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order PETITION TO PREVENT DOMESTIC VIOLENCE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
|
December 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL OF JEANNE LEHMAN [X]RE NTC OF EXPARTE APP FOR ORDERS (RULE16) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.