Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hansen, Naomi L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hansen, Nathan D, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Corie J. Caraway presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCorie J. Caraway Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2006 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1871 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time5060 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Modification DCSS filed 9/23/20 Modification of Child Support, Health Care and Modify Payment on Arrears Judge: Caraway, Corie J |
|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS
Judge: Caraway, Corie J |
|
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event | RFO-OSC-MTN - Modification (DCSS Only) | |
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
June 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing by Respondent filed 04/12/17 Re: Child Support - timeshare hearing - 1 hr est. Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
June 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS
Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
June 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service personal service of cover letter; civil subpoena as to Anita Kay Pevear |
|
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by mail of minutes and order filed 5/16/17; notice of court date 6/27/17 as to respondent and Anita Kay Pevear |
|
May 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing - Modification by Respondent filed 04/12/17 Re: Child Support *OST Denied* Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
May 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS
Judge: Goldkind, Leonard D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.