Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Shaulis, Clair Vicky, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Schneider, Jessica, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Steven R. McNelis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSteven R. McNelis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2006 |
CategoryPre-Jbsis Family Law |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Cycle Time23 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information VERIFICATION THAT PARTY HAS NO GUNS TO BE SOLD OR SURRENDERED PURSUANT TO FC 6389 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAS |
|
January 10, 2007 | Docket Event | RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING *COPY OT BSCO/E-BUNDLING* Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAS | |
January 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [P] OSC: DV/TRO CLETS *NO/CHILDREN* Desc2: FILED 12-27-06 Disp Code: 399 - RESTRAINING ORDER GRANTED-1 YEAR Disp Clerk: SAS Filing Clerk: LXW Judge: McNelis, Steven R |
|
January 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS: TRO, ORD & NTC OF HEARNG, REQ FOR ORD, BLNK ANS TO TRO 01/03/07 (PERSONAL) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JLV |
|
January 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order ANSWER TO TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JLV |
|
December 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order DV-TEMP RESTRAINING ORDER & NTC OF HEARING PETNR/GRANTED *H/D* *BCSO/MENTOR* Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
December 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL OF CLAIR SHAULIS RE: RESUBMISSION OF TRO *BCSO REPORT ATTACHED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
December 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information DENIAL OF TRO/NEED TO ATTACH COPY OF POLICE REPORT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL OF CLAIR SHAULIS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
|
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order PETITION TO PREVENT DOMESTIC VIOLENCE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.