Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Moore, Ardell L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Moore, Paul G, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with William R. Patrick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam R. Patrick Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2003 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions65 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time2414 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information DENIAL OF REISSUANCE/NOT TIMELY/NOT SET FOR HRG *H/D* Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
July 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [P] OSC: DV/TRO CLETS *W/CHILDREN* Desc2: FILED 5/14/10 2ND REISSUANCE Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR, NO APP, NO POS Disp Clerk: JLV Filing Clerk: SAT Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
June 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [P] OSC: DV/TRO CLETS *NO CHILDREN* Desc2: FILED 5/14/10 *1ST REISSUANCE Disp Code: 940 - REISSUED TO 07/14/10 Disp Clerk: SAT Filing Clerk: SAT Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
June 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application without Hearing APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR REISSUANCE OF TRO *H/D* HON. STEVEN R MCNELIS, JUDGE (BSM) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [P] OSC: DV/TRO CLETS *NO CHILDREN* Desc2: FILED 5/14/10 *TEMPS GRANTED* Disp Code: 940 - REISSUED TO 6/23/10 Disp Clerk: SAT Filing Clerk: SAT Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
June 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application without Hearing APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR REISSUANCE OF TRO *H/D* Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
May 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order DV-TEMP RESTRAINING ORDER & NTC OF HEARING PETNR/GRANTED *H/D* HON. TAMARA MOSBARGER; JUDGE (B16) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
May 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order PETITION TO PREVENT DOMESTIC VIOLENCE *NO CHILDREN* Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
May 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF COURT HEARING HON. TAMARA MOSBARGER; JUDGE (B16) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
May 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL OF ARDELL L MOORE *NO NTC* [ ]RE NTC OF EXPARTE APP FOR ORDERS (RULE16) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.