Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Irvin, Timothy, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with William R. Patrick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam R. Patrick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2003 |
CategoryPre-Jbsis Family Law |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Cycle Time1238 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [P] OSC: DV/TRO Desc2: *FILED 04/20/07* *TEMPS GRANTED* Disp Code: 340 - GRANTED - 3 YEARS Disp Clerk: MJO Filing Clerk: SAS Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
May 09, 2007 | Docket Event | RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING (05/09/07 HRNG) CC/BCSO HON. WILLIAM R PATRICK; JUDGE (B04) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MJO | |
April 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF DV/TRO IN PER ON 04/24/07 AS TO [R] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
|
April 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order DV-TEMP RESTRAINING ORDER & NTC OF HEARING PETNR *PP HD* HON. ROBERT A GLUSMAN; JUDGE (B12) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
|
April 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL OF NICOLE L. MONTOYA Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
|
April 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL OF NICOLE MONTOYA [X]RE NTC OF EXPARTE APP FOR ORDERS (RULE16) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
|
April 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order PETITION TO PREVENT DOMESTIC VIOLENCE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
|
April 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information DENIAL OF TRO - NEED MORE INFORMATION *PP HD* Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
|
February 24, 2004 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF RESTRAINING ORDER INFORMATION AS TO RESP Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KKA |
|
December 31, 2003 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [P] OSC/DV Desc2: *FILED 12/18/03* Disp Code: 125 - GRANTED - 3 YEARS Disp Clerk: ARE Filing Clerk: JAR Judge: Patrick, William R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.