Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hughes, Tom E, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bohrer-Hughes, Nichole, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with William R. Patrick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam R. Patrick Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2003 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Time To Trial569 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions780 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time2418 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order STIP & ORDER *COPY MAILED* CK 30442 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 701067 Fee Amount: 20.00 Entry Clerk: TMS 494 - $20.00 |
|
November 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF NTC RE PAYMENT AS TO [P] AILED 11/13/08 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CRW |
|
November 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF NTC RE PAYMENT AS TO [R] MAILED 11/13/08 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CRW |
|
October 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC RE PAYMENT OF SUPPORT (FC4200) (FORMER APP & ORD TO PAY THRU DCSS/BCFTF) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CRW |
|
October 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion hearings - Predispo Desc: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR [R] Desc2: FILED 9/06/07 BY M ATTEBERRY Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR BY COUNSEL/SUB'N HAS BEEN Disp Clerk: MJO Filing Clerk: JAR Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
October 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney SUBST OF ATTY FOR [R] OLD ATTY: MELISSA A. ATTEBERRY NEW ATTY: PRO PER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CRW |
|
October 01, 2007 | Docket Event | INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION PTNR'S Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JAR | |
September 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
RFO-OSC-MTN - Initial (DCSS Only) MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR RESP FILED BY M ATTEBERRY CK# 3162 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 586548 Fee Amount: 40.00 Entry Clerk: JAR 495 - $40.00 |
|
September 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL IN SUPPORT OF ATTY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR RESP Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JAR |
|
September 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information PTNR'S NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JAR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.