Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Devoll, James, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Robbins-Devoll, Cheryl, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2003 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Time To Trial91 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions521 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time2871 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTY FOR [P] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
|
May 06, 2005 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTERED & NOTICES MAILED MSE = 05-06-05 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: LXW | |
April 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Desc: COURT TRIAL Desc2: P'S AT ISSUE FILED 01/13/05-ISS: AF&C, Desc3: S/S, ASSETS, RETIRE ACCT, CREDIT Disp Code: 342 - HEARD, ORDERS MADE Disp Clerk: ARE Filing Clerk: KKA Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
April 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL OF LES HAIT FOR ATTORNEY FEES & COSTS *RCVD BY FAX* Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: LXW |
|
April 14, 2005 | Docket Event | INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION [P] *RCVD BY FAX* Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: LXW | |
March 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Trial Setting Conference Desc: TRAC 4 HR [time est] 1ST TRAC ISSUES Desc2: [P] AT ISSUE FILED 01/13/05 Desc3: ISS: AF, S/S, ASSETS, RETIRE ACC, CREDIT Notice Date: 2005-01-13 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 386 - C/T SET 04/15/05 1:30 PM B10 Disp Clerk: KKA Filing Clerk: SAS Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
January 13, 2005 | Docket Event | AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY PETNR [X] COURT TRIAL 4 HOURS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JAS | |
January 13, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: TRAC 4 HR [time est] 1ST TRAC ISSUES [P] AT ISSUE FILED 01/13/05 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JAS |
|
January 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information RESP'S EXHIBIT LIST Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JAR |
|
January 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information RESP'S STATEMENT OF EXISTING ORDERS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JAR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.