Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mackenzie, Nyla, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mackenzie, Marcus, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with William R. Patrick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam R. Patrick Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2002 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Time To Trial1231 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions360 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time1767 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTY FOR PETNR Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CRW |
|
October 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney SUBST OF ATTY FOR PETNR OLD ATTY: T. BAKER NEW ATTY: PRO PER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CRW |
|
March 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Findings and Order After Hearing FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER HEARING HRG 3-13-07 HON. WILLIAM R PATRICK; JUDGE (B04) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
March 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: REVIEW HEARING (PSYCHOLOGICAL EVAL) Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR BY COUNSEL Disp Clerk: MJO Filing Clerk: MJO Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
January 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
Findings and Order After Hearing FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER HEARING 01/09/07 HRNG MEDA'S FOLDER HON. WILLIAM R PATRICK; JUDGE (B04) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JAR |
|
January 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: REVIEW HEARING (PSYCHOLOGICAL EVAL) Disp Code: 906 - CONT 03/13/07 8:30AM FOR RPT Disp Clerk: MJO Filing Clerk: MJO Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
November 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: REVIEW HEARING (PSYCHOLOGICAL EVAL) Desc2: (SELECTION OF EVALUATOR) Disp Code: 906 - CONT 01/09/07 8:30AM FOR RECEIPT OF RPT Disp Clerk: MJO Filing Clerk: MJO Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
October 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Findings and Order After Hearing FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER HEARING 9/12/06 HRNG - MEDA'S FOLDER HON. WILLIAM R PATRICK; JUDGE (B04) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JAR |
|
September 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: REVIEW HEARING RE: PSYCHOLOGICAL EVAL Desc3: *NEW I&E'S TO BE SUB'D BEFORE THIS DATE* Disp Code: 342 - HRD IN PRT/CONT 11/21/06 8:30AM Disp Clerk: MJO Filing Clerk: TAP Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
May 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Desc: FAMILY LAW - LONG CAUSE - OSC/MTN Desc2: [P] OSC FILED: 7/9/05-MOD CUST, C/S Desc3: VISIT INJ ORD TRANS COST [R] OSC 9/8/05 Disp Code: 342 - CONT FOR REV OF EVALUATOR TO 9/12/06 Disp Clerk: TAP Filing Clerk: JAS Judge: McNelis, Steven R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.