Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hardy, Angela L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hardy, Keith, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2001 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Time To Trial998 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time5622 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by mail on 5/17/17 as to Angela L Anderson Re: Minutes and Order filed 5/2/17 |
|
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS
Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Modification of child support; health care; set payment on arrears Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by mail of notice of motion; responsive declaration to request for order; income & expense declaration as to respondent |
|
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event | RFO-OSC-MTN - Modification (DCSS Only) | |
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by mail of notice of motion; responsive declaration to request for order; income & expense declaration as to petitioner |
|
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by mail on 2/28/17 as to Petitioner Re: Notice Re: Payment of Support - Substitution of Payee; Notice of Registration of CA Support Order; Statement of Registration of CA Support Order |
|
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by mail on 2/28/17 as to Rerspondent Re: Notice Re: Payment of Support - Substitution of Payee; Notice of Registration of CA Support Order; Statement of Registration of CA Support Order |
|
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Statement for Registration of CA Support Order |
|
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Registration of California Support Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.