Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Stephen E. Benson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen E. Benson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 1998 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Minor - Person Only |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: GUARDIANSHIP REVIEW HEARING Desc2: 04/30/14 Notice Date: 2013-06-04 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 399 - G/SHIP CONTINUED; TERMINATES ON 08/13/15 Disp Clerk: DAB Filing Clerk: DLB Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
May 21, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER...CONTINUING GDNSHIP HON. STEPHEN E. BENSON; JUDGE (B07) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DAB | |
May 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order G/S REVIEW REPORT & ORDER HON. STEPHEN E. BENSON; JUDGE (B07) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DAB |
|
April 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Confidential Supplemental Information CONFIDENTIAL: [ ]SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION [X]GUARDIANSHIP STATUS REPORT (GC251) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH |
|
June 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: GUARDIANSHIP REVIEW HEARING 04/30/14 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
|
May 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Memorandum GUARDIANSHIP REVIEW REPORT AND ORDER HON. STEPHEN E. BENSON; JUDGE (B07) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
|
May 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: REVIEW HEARING Desc2: REPORT DUE 5/1/13 Notice Date: 2013-03-19 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 399 - GSHIP CONT, REVIEW 05/21/14 Disp Clerk: DLB Filing Clerk: RLM Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
May 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Confidential Supplemental Information CONFIDENTIAL: [ ]SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION [X]GUARDIANSHIP STATUS REPORT (GC251) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH |
|
March 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: REVIEW HEARING REPORT DUE 5/1/13 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: RLM |
|
May 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Memorandum GUARDIANSHIP REVIEW REPORT AND ORDER HON. STEPHEN E. BENSON; JUDGE (B07) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: BAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.