Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with James F. Reilley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames F. Reilley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 1997 |
CategoryJuvenile Custody Order (Wi362) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Trial Setting Conference Desc: TRAC --- [1/2 DAY EST] Desc2: [MOM] OSC FILED 2/3/10 Desc3: [Issues: MOM'S OBJ TO MED RECOMMENDATION Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR Disp Clerk: DLB Filing Clerk: JAR Judge: Reilley, James F |
|
July 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing Desc: [MOM] OSC: MOD C/C & VISITN Desc2: FILED: 2/3/10 Desc3: *CONT FOR RECOMMENDATION FROM KIM* Disp Code: 363 - SET FOR TRAC 7/26/10 8:30 MOM OBJ TO MED Disp Clerk: JAR Filing Clerk: DLB Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
July 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Report of Child Custody Recommending Counselor REPORT OF SUPERIOR COURT MEDIATION SERVICES ADOPTED AS TEMPORARY ORDER OF THE COURT HON. WILLIAM R PATRICK; JUDGE (B04) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JAR |
|
June 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing Desc: [MOM] OSC: MOD OF C/C, VISIT Desc2: FILED 2/03/10*CONT'D FROM 3/24/10 FOR Desc3: MEDN/RECC/AGREE* Disp Code: 362 - REFER TO MEDN, RTC 7/7/10 @ 8:30 AM Disp Clerk: DLB Filing Clerk: DLB Judge: McNelis, Steven R |
|
May 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Report of Child Custody Recommending Counselor REPORT OF SUPERIOR COURT MEDIATION SERVICES RECD Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MME |
|
March 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Findings and Order After Hearing FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER HEARING HRG 3/24/10 HON. WILLIAM R PATRICK; JUDGE (B04) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
March 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing Desc: [MOTHER] OSC: MOD OF C/C, VISITN Desc2: FILED: 2/3/10 Desc3: *CONT FOR MEDN RECS* Disp Code: 362 - REFER TO MEDN, TEMP ORDER, RTC 6/17/10 Disp Clerk: SAT Filing Clerk: JLV Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
March 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
Report of Child Custody Recommending Counselor REPORT OF SUPERIOR COURT MEDIATION SERVICES Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MME |
|
March 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing Desc: [P] OSC: MOD OF C/C AND VISTN Desc2: *FILED 1/29/10* Desc3: *TEMPS DENIED* Disp Code: 399 - AMENDED OSC FILED Disp Clerk: JAR Filing Clerk: IRB Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
February 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing Desc: [MOTHER] OSC: MOD OF C/C, VISITN W/OST Desc2: FILED 2/3/10 *TEMPS DENIED* Desc3: *AMENDED-ORIG FILED 1/29/10* Disp Code: 362 - REFER TO MEDN, COFFE, RTC: 3/24/10 Disp Clerk: JLV Filing Clerk: JAR Judge: Patrick, William R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.